LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB14
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB14
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB14
Compare Versions
SB14 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB14 Amended August 25, 2011
SB14 Amended May 19, 2011
SB14 Amended March 17, 2011
SB14 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB14 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB14 Amended August 25, 2011
SB14 Amended May 19, 2011
SB14 Amended March 17, 2011
SB14 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare