California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1402 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 17, 2012

Amended

Bill August 20, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 26, 2012