LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1402
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1402
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1402
Compare Versions
SB1402 Chaptered September 17, 2012
SB1402 Enrolled August 30, 2012
SB1402 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1402 Amended August 6, 2012
SB1402 Amended June 26, 2012
SB1402 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1402 Chaptered September 17, 2012
SB1402 Enrolled August 30, 2012
SB1402 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1402 Amended August 6, 2012
SB1402 Amended June 26, 2012
SB1402 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare