|
08/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4632.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4549.) (August 15).
|
|
|
|
08/10/2012
|
Set for hearing August 15.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Set for hearing July 3.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 8. Page 3304.) Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|