California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1403 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2012

Amended

Bill August 29, 2012
Bill August 16, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 28, 2012
Bill June 19, 2012