California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1404 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill July 3, 2012
Bill June 19, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill April 26, 2012