LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1404
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1404
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1404
Compare Versions
SB1404 Chaptered September 29, 2012
SB1404 Enrolled August 30, 2012
SB1404 Amended August 6, 2012
SB1404 Amended July 3, 2012
SB1404 Amended June 19, 2012
SB1404 Amended May 25, 2012
SB1404 Amended April 26, 2012
SB1404 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1404 Chaptered September 29, 2012
SB1404 Enrolled August 30, 2012
SB1404 Amended August 6, 2012
SB1404 Amended July 3, 2012
SB1404 Amended June 19, 2012
SB1404 Amended May 25, 2012
SB1404 Amended April 26, 2012
SB1404 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare