|
09/20/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 411, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5010.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6460.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6203.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and V.A.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3497.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3188.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2012
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|