LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1405
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1405
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1405
Compare Versions
SB1405 Chaptered September 20, 2012
SB1405 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1405 Amended August 23, 2012
SB1405 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1405 Amended June 19, 2012
SB1405 Amended April 10, 2012
SB1405 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1405 Chaptered September 20, 2012
SB1405 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1405 Amended August 23, 2012
SB1405 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1405 Amended June 19, 2012
SB1405 Amended April 10, 2012
SB1405 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare