|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 657, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4855.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6200.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3617.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Set for hearing May 21.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3460.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|