California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1407 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill June 20, 2012
Bill June 12, 2012
Bill April 30, 2012
Bill April 16, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012