|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 872, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4965.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 2. Page 6351.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 3696.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3596.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3143.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|