LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1410
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1410
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1410
Compare Versions
SB1410 Chaptered September 30, 2012
SB1410 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB1410 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1410 Amended May 25, 2012
SB1410 Amended April 26, 2012
SB1410 Amended March 29, 2012
SB1410 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1410 Chaptered September 30, 2012
SB1410 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB1410 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1410 Amended May 25, 2012
SB1410 Amended April 26, 2012
SB1410 Amended March 29, 2012
SB1410 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare