|
09/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 492, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4681.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6074.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4286.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4163.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Set for hearing June 26.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|