LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1421
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1421
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1421
Compare Versions
SB1421 Chaptered September 23, 2012
SB1421 Enrolled August 23, 2012
SB1421 Amended August 13, 2012
SB1421 Amended April 25, 2012
SB1421 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1421 Chaptered September 23, 2012
SB1421 Enrolled August 23, 2012
SB1421 Amended August 13, 2012
SB1421 Amended April 25, 2012
SB1421 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare