|
08/17/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 179, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5848.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4222.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4012.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
06/08/2012
|
Set for hearing June 19.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Set for hearing May 1. Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|