California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1425 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 9, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 17, 2012

Amended

Bill June 26, 2012
Bill May 30, 2012
Bill April 25, 2012