|
09/30/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 4771.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 11. Page 6146.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 3699.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3313.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|