California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1434 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 7, 2012
Bill June 28, 2012
Bill May 24, 2012
Bill May 1, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012