|
09/14/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 333, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4965.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 4. Page 6335.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6086.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3530.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3446.) (May 7).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|