LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1446
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1446
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1446
Compare Versions
SB1446 Chaptered September 14, 2012
SB1446 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB1446 Amended August 22, 2012
SB1446 Amended June 28, 2012
SB1446 Amended June 12, 2012
SB1446 Amended May 14, 2012
SB1446 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1446 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1446 Chaptered September 14, 2012
SB1446 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB1446 Amended August 22, 2012
SB1446 Amended June 28, 2012
SB1446 Amended June 12, 2012
SB1446 Amended May 14, 2012
SB1446 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1446 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare