|
09/30/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 381, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2143.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 7. Page 2510.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2450.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 986.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 764.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 616.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|