LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB146
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB146
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB146
Compare Versions
SB146 Chaptered September 30, 2011
SB146 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB146 Amended August 18, 2011
SB146 Amended June 7, 2011
SB146 Amended April 12, 2011
SB146 Amended March 30, 2011
SB146 Amended March 15, 2011
SB146 Introduced February 1, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB146 Chaptered September 30, 2011
SB146 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB146 Amended August 18, 2011
SB146 Amended June 7, 2011
SB146 Amended April 12, 2011
SB146 Amended March 30, 2011
SB146 Amended March 15, 2011
SB146 Introduced February 1, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare