|
09/30/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4978.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6338.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6086.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 3698.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3597.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Set for hearing May 21.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3460.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|