California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1476 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Amended

Bill August 22, 2012
Bill July 2, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012