|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 283, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 4761.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5970.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3667.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3313.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
03/30/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|