California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1489 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2012

Amended

Bill June 26, 2012
Bill June 11, 2012
Bill April 26, 2012