|
09/13/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 307, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 4847.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 6200.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 2679.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2640.) (January 10). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|