LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB149
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB149
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB149
Compare Versions
SB149 Chaptered September 13, 2012
SB149 Enrolled August 30, 2012
SB149 Amended May 25, 2012
SB149 Amended January 11, 2012
SB149 Amended January 4, 2012
SB149 Introduced February 1, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB149 Chaptered September 13, 2012
SB149 Enrolled August 30, 2012
SB149 Amended May 25, 2012
SB149 Amended January 11, 2012
SB149 Amended January 4, 2012
SB149 Introduced February 1, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare