California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB149 Amended / Bill

Filed 01/11/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 149AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JANUARY 11, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JANUARY 4, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Correa FEBRUARY 1, 2011 An act to amend Section 18506 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to mobilehomes. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 149, as amended, Correa. Mobilehome Parks Act: permit invoice: notice. The Mobilehome Parks Act generally regulates various classifications of mobilehome and related vehicle parks, including special occupancy parks, and imposes enforcement duties on the Department of Housing and Community Development and local enforcement agencies. The act requires any person prior to operating a manufactured housing community or mobilehome park to obtain a valid permit that is issued by the enforcement agency. Existing law requires that the permit be issued and invoiced according to a method and schedule established by the department. The Mobilehome Residency Law governs tenancies in mobilehome parks, and imposes various duties on the owners of mobilehome parks and the agents and representatives authorized to act on behalf of the owners. This bill would require that the invoice for the permit to operate provide notice  that a copy  of the Mobilehome Residency Law  is available, upon request   and where it may be obtained  . Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 18506 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 18506. A permit to operate shall be issued by the enforcement agency. A copy of each permit to operate shall be forwarded to the department. A permit to operate shall not be issued for a park when the previous operating permit has been suspended by the enforcement agency until the violations which were the basis for the suspension have been corrected. Any park which was in existence on September 15, 1961, shall not be denied a permit to operate if the park complied with the law which this part supersedes. A permit to operate shall be issued for a 12-month period and invoiced according to a method and schedule established by the department. The invoice shall provide notice  that a copy  of the Mobilehome Residency Law (Chapter 2.5 (commencing with Section 798) of Title 2 of Part 2 of Division 2 of the Civil Code)  is available, upon request   and where it may be obtained  . Any permit application returned to the enforcement agency 30 days after the due date shall be subject to a penalty fee equal to 10 percent of the established fee. The penalty fee for submitting a permit application 60 or more days after the due date shall equal 100 percent of the established permit fee. The penalty and the established permit fee shall be paid prior to issuance of the permit, and the fee and 100 percent penalty shall be due upon demand of the enforcement agency for any park which has not applied for a permit.