|
07/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 62, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1572.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2052.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1171.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 950.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 864.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|