LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB150
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB150
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB150
Compare Versions
SB150 Chaptered July 8, 2011
SB150 Enrolled June 28, 2011
SB150 Amended June 9, 2011
SB150 Amended May 17, 2011
SB150 Amended April 25, 2011
SB150 Amended April 7, 2011
SB150 Introduced February 1, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB150 Chaptered July 8, 2011
SB150 Enrolled June 28, 2011
SB150 Amended June 9, 2011
SB150 Amended May 17, 2011
SB150 Amended April 25, 2011
SB150 Amended April 7, 2011
SB150 Introduced February 1, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare