|
09/26/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 598, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5021.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6356.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6171.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5895.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5761.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3641.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Set for hearing May 21.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3210.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|