LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1500
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1500
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1500
Compare Versions
SB1500 Chaptered September 26, 2012
SB1500 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1500 Amended August 23, 2012
SB1500 Amended August 6, 2012
SB1500 Amended June 26, 2012
SB1500 Amended June 13, 2012
SB1500 Amended May 23, 2012
SB1500 Amended May 15, 2012
SB1500 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1500 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1500 Chaptered September 26, 2012
SB1500 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1500 Amended August 23, 2012
SB1500 Amended August 6, 2012
SB1500 Amended June 26, 2012
SB1500 Amended June 13, 2012
SB1500 Amended May 23, 2012
SB1500 Amended May 15, 2012
SB1500 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1500 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare