LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1522
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1522
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1522
Compare Versions
SB1522 Chaptered September 27, 2012
SB1522 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1522 Amended August 22, 2012
SB1522 Amended June 18, 2012
SB1522 Amended April 26, 2012
SB1522 Amended April 17, 2012
SB1522 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1522 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1522 Chaptered September 27, 2012
SB1522 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1522 Amended August 22, 2012
SB1522 Amended June 18, 2012
SB1522 Amended April 26, 2012
SB1522 Amended April 17, 2012
SB1522 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1522 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare