California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1522 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 22, 2012
Bill June 18, 2012
Bill April 26, 2012
Bill April 17, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012