|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 625, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 4681.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6021.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 3741.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3598.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3232.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2012
|
Set for hearing April 11 in ED. pending receipt.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|