California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1525 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill July 2, 2012
Bill May 29, 2012
Bill April 26, 2012
Bill March 27, 2012