|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 797, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 4856.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 6188.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6052.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 3493.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3445.) (May 7).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3230.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|