California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1529 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 21, 2012
Bill August 7, 2012
Bill June 27, 2012
Bill June 6, 2012
Bill April 24, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012