California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1576 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 23, 2012
Bill August 20, 2012
Bill July 2, 2012
Bill June 11, 2012
Bill April 12, 2012