LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1576
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1576
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1576
Compare Versions
SB1576 Chaptered September 27, 2012
SB1576 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1576 Amended August 23, 2012
SB1576 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1576 Amended July 2, 2012
SB1576 Amended June 11, 2012
SB1576 Amended April 12, 2012
SB1576 Introduced March 12, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1576 Chaptered September 27, 2012
SB1576 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1576 Amended August 23, 2012
SB1576 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1576 Amended July 2, 2012
SB1576 Amended June 11, 2012
SB1576 Amended April 12, 2012
SB1576 Introduced March 12, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare