|
08/25/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B., P. & C.P. Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 5. Page 1236.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1113.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 786.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|