LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB173
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB173
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB173
Compare Versions
SB173 Amended August 15, 2011
SB173 Amended May 31, 2011
SB173 Amended May 4, 2011
SB173 Amended May 3, 2011
SB173 Amended March 30, 2011
SB173 Introduced February 7, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB173 Amended August 15, 2011
SB173 Amended May 31, 2011
SB173 Amended May 4, 2011
SB173 Amended May 3, 2011
SB173 Amended March 30, 2011
SB173 Introduced February 7, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare