|
09/21/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 303, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 2148.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2591.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Amend and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 438.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 359.) (March 16).
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
Set for hearing March 16.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|