California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB193 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2011

Amended

Bill May 16, 2011
Bill May 2, 2011