|
09/25/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 549, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4863.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6180.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2722.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2685.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Set for hearing January 19.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2012
|
Set for hearing January 17.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2623.) (January 10).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
12/21/2011
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|