LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB200
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB200
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB200
Compare Versions
SB200 Chaptered September 25, 2012
SB200 Enrolled August 30, 2012
SB200 Amended June 25, 2012
SB200 Amended June 4, 2012
SB200 Amended January 24, 2012
SB200 Amended January 11, 2012
SB200 Amended January 4, 2012
SB200 Amended March 24, 2011
SB200 Introduced February 8, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB200 Chaptered September 25, 2012
SB200 Enrolled August 30, 2012
SB200 Amended June 25, 2012
SB200 Amended June 4, 2012
SB200 Amended January 24, 2012
SB200 Amended January 11, 2012
SB200 Amended January 4, 2012
SB200 Amended March 24, 2011
SB200 Introduced February 8, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare