|
07/26/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 124, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/26/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 1782.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 11. Page 2228.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 3. Page 707.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 11).
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|