LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB203
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB203
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB203
Compare Versions
SB203 Chaptered July 26, 2011
SB203 Enrolled July 12, 2011
SB203 Amended May 31, 2011
SB203 Amended March 31, 2011
SB203 Introduced February 8, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB203 Chaptered July 26, 2011
SB203 Enrolled July 12, 2011
SB203 Amended May 31, 2011
SB203 Amended March 31, 2011
SB203 Introduced February 8, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare